Secretary of state under president reagan
WebSecretary of the Interior Under Secretary of the Interior; James G. Watt: 1981-1983 : Donald P. Hodel: 1981-1983 : William P. Clark: 1983-1985 : J. J. “Jake” Simmons III: 1983-1984 : … Web29 Jan 2024 · Retired General Jim Mattis served as President Trump’s Secretary of Defense. Colin Powell, a retired U.S. Army General, served as U.S. Secretary of State under President George W. Bush. Retired General Alexander Meigs Haig Jr. was the U.S. Secretary of State under President Reagan as well as the White House chief of staff under …
Secretary of state under president reagan
Did you know?
Web18 Oct 2024 · Carlucci succeeded Mr. Weinberger as defense secretary under Reagan.) “Anybody who becomes a senior officer had better have some political instincts or you’re going to get ground up,” Mr ... Web3 Jun 2024 · The head of EPA is the administrator, a cabinet-level political appointee nominated by the President and confirmed by the Senate.EPA's administrator is responsible for managing and enforcing the nation's environmental laws and regulations, preparing the annual budget of the agency, leading U.S. government efforts related to the environment …
Web7 Feb 2024 · In this Nov. 15, 2010, file photo, former Secretary of State George Shultz speaks at University of California Davis during the Governors' Global Climate Summit 3: Building the Green Economy, in Sacramento, Calif. Shultz, former President Ronald Reagan’s longtime secretary of state, who spent most of the 1980s trying to improve relations with … WebFormerly chief executive officer at the investment firm of Merrill Lynch, Donald.T. Regan (1918 - 2003) was appointed Secretary of the Treasury by President Ronald Reagan in 1981 and became the champion of Reagan's plan to cut taxes in order to stimulate investment. The Economic Recovery Act of 1981 introduced sweeping tax cuts which especially …
WebPresident Reagan appointed Dr. Roberts Assistant Secretary of the Treasury for Economic Policy and he was confirmed in office by the U.S. Senate. From 1975 to 1978, Dr. Roberts served on the congressional staff where he drafted the Kemp-Roth bill and played a leading role in developing bipartisan support for a supply-side economic policy. WebFormerly chief executive officer at the investment firm of Merrill Lynch, Donald.T. Regan (1918 - 2003) was appointed Secretary of the Treasury by President Ronald Reagan in …
WebPresident appointed by Julius C. Holmes: January 29, 1945 August 17, 1945 Franklin D. Roosevelt: Frank McCarthy: September 1, 1945 October 11, 1945 Harry Truman: Donald S. … scarsdale vets learning portalWebAlexander Meigs Haig, Jr. was appointed Secretary of State by President Ronald Reagan and assumed the office on January 22, 1981. He served a relatively short time in office, … scarsdale vic weatherWebGeorge Pratt Shultz (/ ʃ ʊ l t s /; December 13, 1920 – February 6, 2024) was an American economist, businessman, diplomat and statesman.He served in various positions under two different Republican presidents and is one of the only two persons to have held four different Cabinet-level posts, the other being Elliot Richardson. Shultz played a major role in … scarsdale victoria historyWebSecretary of State James Baker Bush brought his own considerable foreign policy experience to the presidency. In addition to his eight years as Vice President, he had served as Ambassador to the United Nations, U.S. envoy to the People’s Republic of China, and as Director of the CIA. scarsdale warehouse hornby buildingsWeb14 Apr 2024 · President Reagan and his wife had a very productive visit to Jamaica. They were exposed to bits of Jamaican culture and also engaged in high-level talks with the nation’s leaders. Published Thursday, April 8, 1982 Rousing welcome for Reagan -... scarsdale weather now radarWeb4 Oct 2024 · And most notably, under President Ronald Reagan, he was secretary of state. At age 96, Secretary Shultz is a fellow at Stanford University's Hoover Institution. scarsdale waterWebKissinger also holds the distinction of serving as National Security Advisor and Secretary of State at the same time from September 22, 1973, until November 3, 1975. He holds the … rule of nine for infants